Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Department Of Finance Of Sussex County, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Adams, Ryan T, Bleshman, Rachel, against Hudson Et Al, John R., Hudson, Iris A, Hudson, John R, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with ROBERT H. ROBINSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT H. ROBINSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
A Payment of -$69,908.72 was made on receipt SCU9411992. RECEIPT FILED |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RECEIVED FROM SUSSEX COUNTY COUNCIL, CHECK NO. 1219897 IN THE AMOUNT OF $69,908.72 FOR EXCESS PROCEEDS - MT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 11, 2022 NOTICE |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ROBERT H. ROBINSON, JR. ON 05-02-2022. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: THE COURT HEREBY CONFIRMS THE SALE AND DIRECTS THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY TO EXECUTE, ACKNOWLEDGE AND DELIVER A DEED CONVEYING TITLE TO THE PROPERTY PETITIONER, EURO HOMES, INC, IN THE FORM ATTACHED TO THE PETITION AS EXHIBIT "A" . ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67577164 ORDER |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DEED OF CONVEYANCE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 30, 2022 PETITION FOR DEED OF CONVEYANCE EXHIBIT A PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67518900 PETITION DEED OF CONVEYANCE |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67484490 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-REDEMPTION |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2022 WRIT RETURNED 02-21-2022. LANDS AND TENEMENTS ADVERTISED AND SOLD ON 01-18-22 AT 9:30AM AND THEREAFTER, AT THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE IN GEORGETOWN, GEORGETOWN HUNDRED , SUSSEX COUNTY, STATE OF DELAWARE TO EURO HOMES INC, BIDDER, NAREK HOVHANNISYAN, THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BIDDER FOR THE SUM OF EIGHTY THOUSAND DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($80,000.00) THEY BEING THE BEST AND HIGHEST BID. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67331731 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL EXHIBITS A THROUGH C TO AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67228063 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2021 VEND EX WRIT ISSUED 11-09-2021, TO THE SHERIFF OF SUSSEX COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 67080541 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 67073924 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 WRIT RETURNED 08-17-2021, SUMMONS WAS POSTED 08-16-2021 ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY. ACCEPTED BY: SB TRANSACTION ID: 66854407 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.