Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Conway, Daniel T, against White, Cynthia A, White, Gary L, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with T. Henley Graves presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryWrit Of Possession |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 8, 2017 NOTICE |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12-7-2017 REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DISMISSED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2017 TRL SCHD: DISMISS PRIOR TRIAL |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE T. HENLEY GRAVES 5-8-2017 IT IS ORDERED THAT THE WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2017 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60566703 ORDER |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2017 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60554182 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2017 SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD FILED 3-29-2017 - IT IS ORDERED THAT A 1-DAY BENCH TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 12-7-2017 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60404075 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD (FTR) COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD PRESIDING DATES ESTABLISHED FOR SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 28, 2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2017 EXHIBIT A DEED IN LIEU TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION EXHIBIT B NOTICE TO VACATE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60375583 EXHIBITS |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 23, 2017 LETTER FROM GARY AND CYNTHIA WHITE TO THE COURT FILED 3-13-2017 - REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF 3-21-2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTIFICATION OF ADDRESS CHANGE NOTE FROM CASE MANAGER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF 3-21-2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60373559 LETTER |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REMOVED FROM 3-21-2017 CALENDAR; DANIEL CONWAY ESQUIRE NOT AVAILABLE RESCHEDULED FOR 3-28-2017 AT 9:00 A.M. DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2017 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2017 COPY OF 3-8-2017 LETTER FROM DANIEL T. CONWAY ESQUIRE REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF 3-21-2017 CONFERENCE; REQUEST GRANTED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD 3-9-2017 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 60327545 NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.