Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pross, Christina J, against Burnham, Jeffrey C, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2017 NOTICE |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY RICHARD F. STOKES, JUDGE 3-20-17. IT IS ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60359794 ORDER |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2017 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60352603 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: 1/17/17 - AWB DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 21, 2017 SERVED JEFFREY C BURNHAM BY SERVING JOHN STAPLETON, RENTER ON 1-12-17. ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60098907 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON JEFFREY C BURNHAM 1/10/17 - AWB DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 10, 2017 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2016 COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECKLIST EXHIBIT E - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE EXHIBIT F - CERTIFIED MORTGAGE AND ASSIGNMENT(S) EXHIBIT G - FDCA NOTICE PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SUSSEX CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 60002588 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION (IN REM) (MORTGAGE BOOK 3649, PAGE 11) (CHRISTINA J PROSS) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2016 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.