Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Patterson, Thomas Edward, Patterson, Thomas E, represented by Berkeley-Ayres, Michelle D, Dignon, Neil F, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY RICHARD F. STOKES, JUDGE 3-20-17. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE JUDGMENT IS VACATED AND THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60359679 ORDER |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2017 STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60345770 STIPULATION |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2017 NOTICE |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE RICHARD F. STOKES IT IS SO ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AND AGAINST THOMAS E PATTERSON ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60146273 ORDER |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2017 STIPULATED TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST THOMAS E PATTERSON A/K/A THOMAS EDWARD PATTERSON AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL AMOUNT 383,901.83 INTEREST 74,795.45 LATE CHARGES 7,413.90 CORPORATE ADVANCES 9,434.15 ESCROW BALANCE OF 6,772.47 CORPORATE ADVANCE CREDIT 0.00 TOTAL AMOUNT DUE: $480,597.80 ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60118902 (DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTED TO REFLECT JUDGMENT AMOUNT - MT 3/1/17) STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2017 LOSS MITIGATION EXEMPTION AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60118800 AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2017 4F4 AFFIDAVIT EXHIBITS FOR 4F4 ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60118871 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2017 NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60118761 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2017 CONSENT LETTER TO COURT REQUESTING THE RULE TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARINGS BE REMOVED ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60028700 LETTER |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
I DAY NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED 1/23/17: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2017 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.