Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Fitch, Lawrence, represented by Miller, Chase N, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with GRAVES, T. HENLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2015 NOTICE |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 5, 2015 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 58110760 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 31, 2015 LETTER FROM CHASE MILLER TO COURT RE: CHANGE OF AFFILIATIONCHASE N. MILLER, ESQUIRE, IS AFFILIATED WITH THE FIRM MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY, P.C. AND IS NO LONGER WITH MORRIS SCHNEIDER WITTSTADT, LLC OR BUTLER & HOSCH, P.A. ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 58090578 NOTICE |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 23, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A TRIAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION, WHICH MUST BE VERIFIED BEFORE ANY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF WILL PLACE THE MATTER ON THE COURT'S DORMANT DOCKET NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM TODAY. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 57118321 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2015 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 57055836 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION (NO FEE) DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2015 CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION. BORROWER ELECTS TO PARTICIPATE. CARLTON BOWERS, HOUSING COUNSELOR. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 56929507 CERTIFICATE PARTICIPATION PA |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 20, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M.; MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 56897538 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION (NO FEE) DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2015 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. A CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 9, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 56751283 CERTIFICATE PARTICIPATION PA |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2015 WRIT RETURNED ON 1-14-15. SERVED LAWRENCE FITCH BY SERVING JEFF FITCH, SON, ON 1-13-15. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 56603963 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE FOR SERVICE ON LAWRENCE FITCH - MMT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2015 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.