Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Conway, Daniel T, against Anthony, Steve E, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with BRADLEY, E. SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2015 NOTICE |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE SCHEDULED MEDIATION CONFERENCE SHALL BE CANCELLED. ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56751231 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2015 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56741610 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2015 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. MEDIATION IS SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 9, 2015 AT 11:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56544590 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 24, 2014 WRIT RETURNED 12-23-14 SERVED STEVE ANTHONY PERSONALLY ON 12-22-14 ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56512925 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON STEVE E ANTHONY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2014 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 16, 2014 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECKLIST EXHIBIT E-CERTIFIED MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F - FAIR DEBT EXHIBIT G - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AMOUNTS DUE ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56468230 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION - HM (IN REM ONLY) (DANIEL CONWAY) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 16, 2014 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.