Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bradley, E. Scott filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Meyers, Rodney K, represented by Conway, Daniel T, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with BRADLEY, E. SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2016 WRIT RETURNED 12-19-16 LANDS AND TENEMENTS SOLD ON 11-15-16 TO BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FOR THE SUM OF $117,000.00 ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 59975619 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2016 PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 59826794 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED 9-8-16 - HM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2016 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 WRIT PRAECIPE EXHIBIT-LEGAL ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 59496225 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 30, 2016 LISA HATFIELD HEREBY WITHDRAWS AND DANIEL CONWAY HEREBY ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 59482576 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2015 NOTICE |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED 4-30-15 - HM DATE DOCKETED: MAY 1, 2015 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: RODNEY K MEYERS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL $117456.64 INTEREST $14842.32 LATE CHARGES $306.35 ESCROW ADVANCES $3822.59 TOTAL FEES $28.54 SUSPENSE FEES (5%) $89.00 $.00 ATTORNEY FEES $6614.95 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $142982.39 DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN REM AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57163484 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 28, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF LISA R. HATFIELD, NOTICE TO TENANTS AND LIENHOLDERS OF FORECLOSURE ACTION ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56982181 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 9, 2015 WRIT RETURNED ON 1-8-15. SERVED RODNEY K. MEYERS PERSONALLY ON 1-7-15. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 56572604 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON RODNEY K MEYERS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2015 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.