Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Inc, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnett, Thomas D, Conway, Daniel T, against Knothe, Charles S, Whitby, James F, Whitby, Wayne D, Whitby, Michael J, Whitby, Janice A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 20, 2017 WRIT RETURNED ON 6-19-17. LANDS AND TENEMENTS ADVERTISED AND SOLD ON 5-16-17 AT 9:30 A.M. TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $42,000.00. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 60749358 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 16, 2017 PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60601204 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2017 LETTER FROM DANIEL T. CONWAY TO THE COURT. RE: ATLANTIC LAW GROUP LLC MERGED WITH ORLANS PC AND WILL NOW BE DOING BUSINESS AS ORLANCS PC ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60430702 LETTER |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED ON 3-20-17 - MMT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 20, 2017 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
ALIAS LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2017 - ALIAS WRIT - ALIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60326559 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: 1/18/17 - AWB DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 21, 2017 LANDS AND TENEMENTS TO BE SOLD ON 1-17-17 AND SALE STAYED ON 1-17-17. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60098885 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 14, 2017 PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60068891 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 3, 2017 NOTICE |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED 11-/14/16 - AWB DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 14, 2016 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2016 WRIT PRAECIPE EXHIBIT-LEGAL ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59778077 LEVARI FACIAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.