Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bordley, Hunter J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kuhl, Arthur D, Walsh, Douglas T, Rhoades, Joseph J, against Dart, Supplee, Shirley M, Poole, Ronald L, Delaware Administration For Regional Transit, Delaware Transit Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2017 NOTICE |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY RICHARD F. STOKES, JUDGE 3-20-17. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 60359854 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 26, 2017 LETTER FROM JOSEPH J. RHOADES, ESQUIRE TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD F. STOKES ADVISING THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR BINDING ARBITRATION ON MARCH 10, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 60115647 LETTER |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
5 DAY JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED 2/6/17: DISMISSED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 13, 2016 TRL SCHD: DISMISS PRIOR TRIAL |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED 1/4/17 REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 13, 2016 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
BINDING ARBITRATION LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2016 LETTER FROM ALAN BARRACLOUGH TO COUNSEL RE: BINDING ARBITRATION CONFIRMATION LETTER ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59901455 BINDING ARBITRATION LETTER |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2016 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD F. STOKES ADVISING THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO BINDING ARBITRATION ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59900635 LETTER |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2016 PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SUPPLEE ONLY ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59898694 PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISS |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
VACATION OF DEPOSITION DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2016 NOTICE TO VACATE DEPOSITION OF LANCE WATTS SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2016 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59824513 VACATION OF DEPOSITION |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 26, 2016 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF LANCE WATTS SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 59744637 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.