Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leon, Laura Lizette, Leon-Tirado, Esbeydi, Tirado-Elvira, Honoria, Leon-Delfin, Alberto, Leon-Tirado, Anayeli, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Young, Jeffrey A, Silverman, Michael I, Brockstedt, Chase T, against Timothy B Ohare Custom Builder Inc, Caballero, Jose Luis, Caballero, Valentine, Caballero-Zamoro, Juan Octavio, Caballero Construction Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with BRADLEY, E. SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED 3-6-17 - HM DISMISSED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2015 TRL SCHD: DISMISS PRIOR TRIAL |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED 2-7-17 - HM DISMISSED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2015 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED -MT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2015 NOTICE |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2015 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 58096299 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2015 CABALLERO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DEFENDANT JUAN CABALLERO'S AFFIDAVIT FOR DISCOVERY CABALLERO DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS FOR DISCOVERY ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57267896 DISCOVERY |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2015 SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ALICIA B. HOWARD FILED 5-20-15 $150.00 TRIAL FEE IS DUE 1-6-17 PRETRIAL STIPULATION IS DUE 1-31-17 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 2-7-17 AT 9:00 A.M. FOUR DAY JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 3-6-17 ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57272329 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD COMMISSIONER ALICIA B HOWARD PRESIDING DATES ESTABLISHED FOR SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2015 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2015 CABALLERO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57267896 DISCOVERY |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2015 TIMOTHY B. O'HARE CUSTOM BUILDER, INC.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TIMOTHY B. O'HARE CUSTOM BUILDER, INC.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 57236527 DISCOVERY |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2015 LETTER FROM KENDRA MILLS, CASE MANAGER TO COUNSEL 5-6-2015 - NOTIFICATION OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 5-20-2015 AT 9:15 AM ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 57191590 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.