Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tammac Holdings Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Doughty, Kristi J, against Saldivar, Silvia Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with BRADLEY, E. SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2017 NOTICE |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2015 WRIT RETURNED 10-7-15 10 DAY NOTICE WAS POSTED ON THE PROPERTY BY DEPUTY, RETURNED PER THE ATTORNEYS REQUEST ON 10-6-15 EMAIL ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57982375 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED ON 8-4-15 - MMT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2015 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2015 ROBERT AULGUR, JR. WITHDRAWS AS COUNSEL AND KRISTI DOUGHTY ENTERS HER APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57627951 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2015 PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN WRIT OF REPLEVIN ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 57627973 PRAECIPE FILED |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 25, 2015 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS HELD ON 2-20-15 ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56817431 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE HELD 2-20-15 - HM JUDGE E. SCOTT BRADLEY PRESIDING MOTION DENIED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2015 MOTION DENIED |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2015 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56789283 RESPONSE |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2015 LETTER FROM HEATHER MCCABE TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE LITIGANT FILED 2-11-15 RE: MOTION HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED UNTIL 2-20-15 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56759991 LETTER |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2015 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 19, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M. THIS IS NOT A MOTION DAY, WILL BE RESCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 20, 2015 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56752464 MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.