Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Z E A Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mccartney, Deirdre A, against C Gnabs Llc, Stefani, Amy, Stefani, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with BRADLEY, E. SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2015 NOTICE |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2014 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56530313 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2014 EXHIBIT B- PROOF OF MAILING AND CERTIFIED MAIL AS TO AMY STEFANI ACCEPTED ON 12-18-14 ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56508255 EXHIBITS |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2014 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56508255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2014 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - CERTIFIED MAIL ACCEPTED AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL ATTACHMENT TO AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56508255 AMENDMENT UNDER RULE 4H |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2014 EXHIBIT A- PROOF OF MAILING AND SIGNED GREEN CARD ACCEPTED ON 12-18-14 ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 56508255 EXHIBITS |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2014 ALIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56503872 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2014 WRIT RETURNED 12-17-14 NON EST AS TO C GNABS LLC ON 12-16-14 BUSINESS IS PRIMO HOAGIES, DOORS ARE LOCKED AND THE NEIGHBORING BUSINESS ADVISED THEY WRE CLOSED FOR THE SEASON AND POSSIBLY PERMANENTLY ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 56486987 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
LONG ARM WRIT ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED TO COUNSEL FOR SERVICE UPON CHRIS STEFANI DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2014 LONG ARM SERVICE ISSUED |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
LONG ARM WRIT ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED TO COUNSEL FOR SERVICE UPON AMY STEFANI DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2014 LONG ARM SERVICE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.