Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Piper, Robert, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with T. Henley Graves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeT. Henley Graves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 9, 2013 NOTICE |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS PETITION: DENIED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 9, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY T. HENLEY GRAVES, JUDGE 1-8-2013 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 48807636 MISCELLANEOUS PETITION: DENIED |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - HABEAS CORPUS (PRO SE) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 28, 2012 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED 12-27-2012 ACCEPTED BY: BC TRANSACTION ID: 48609550 MISC-HABEAS CORPUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.