Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Administrator, Program filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Justice, Jacquelyn, represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTOKES, RICHARD F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 21, 2013 NOTICE |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2013 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 52133724 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: 12/21/12 DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 22, 2012 SERVED JACQUELYN JUSTICE PERSONALLY ON 12-20-12 ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 48565337 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON JACQUELYN JUSTICE 12/13/12 - AWB DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 13, 2012 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION (IN REM) (ROBERT T AULGER, JR) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 11, 2012 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 11, 2012 COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS CIS SHEET NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION-EXHIBIT A CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION-EXHIBIT B UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM-EXHIBIT C FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK LIST-EXHIBIT D EXHIBIT E EXHIBIT F EXHIBIT G EXHIBIT H ACCEPTED BY: HM TRANSACTION ID: 48305820 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.