Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sussex County Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pryor, David T, Tarburton, John E, against Warner, Eric G, Warner, Joy D, in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTOKES, RICHARD F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2012 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 13, 2013 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF SALE OF REAL ESTATE PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69(G) EXHIBIT A- NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS, TENANTS, RECORD OWNERS AND PERSONS HAVING AN INTEREST IN A SHERIFF'S SALE OF REAL ESTATE EXHIBIT B- POSTING AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT C- CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 54541047 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 30, 2013 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS, TENANTS, RECORD OWNERS AND PERSONS HAVING AN INTEREST IN A SHERIFF'S SALE OF REAL ESTATE EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS, TENANTS, RECORD OWNERS AND PERSONS HAVING AN INTEREST IN A SHERIFF'S SALE OF REAL ESTATE SHERIFF ADVERTISEMENT OF SALE FOR NOVEMBER 19, 2013 ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 54459294 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED 9/10/13 DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 EXECUTION WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS ALIAS LEVARI FACIAS LEGAL DESCRIPTION OF REAL ESTATE TO LEVARI FACIAS ALIAS EXECUTION PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 54043669 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 28, 2013 LETTER FROM DAVID T. PRYOR, ESQUIRE. TO COURT RESPECTFULLY REQUESTING THAT CASE BE MOVED TO THE ACTIVE DOCKET AS DEFENDANTS HAVE RECEIVED THEIR DISCHARGE IN THEIR BANKRUPTCY ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 53910073 LETTER |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 6, 2013 LETTER FROM DAVID T. PRYOR, ESQ. TO COURT RESPECTFULLY REQUESTING THAT CASE BE MOVED TO THE DORMANT DOCKET AS PLAINTIFF HAS RECEIVED NOTIFICATION THAT THE DEFENDANTS HAVE FILED CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 52615254 LETTER |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 17, 2013 LANDS AND TENEMENTS TO BE SOLD ON MAY 21, 2013 AND SALE STAYED ON MAY 14, 2013. RETURNED TO COURT PER ATTORNEY. LETTER ATTACHED. ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 52320251 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 8, 2013 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF SALE OF REAL ESTATE PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69(G) EXHIBIT A- NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS, TENANTS, RECORD OWNERS AND PERSONS HAVING AN INTEREST IN A SHERIFF'S SALE OF REAL ESTATE EXHIBIT B- POSTING AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT C- CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 52148513 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 30, 2013 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS, TENANTS, RECORD OWNERS AND PERSONS HAVING AN INTEREST IN A SHERIFF'S SALE OF REAL ESTATE EXHIBIT A SHERIFF SALE ADVERTISEMENT FOR MAY 21, 2013 ACCEPTED BY: AWB TRANSACTION ID: 52011549 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE HAS BEEN ARCHIVED - MT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2013 NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.