Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Structured Settlement case in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE, . Sussex County, DE Superior Courts with MARK H. CONNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryStructured Settlement |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSussex County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 19, 2021 NOTICE |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 9-17-21 - MMT JUDGE MARK H. CONNER PRESIDING - PETITION FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT WAS GRANTED - MR. MARTINELLI WAS PRESENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 MOTION GRANTED |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2021 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM CIVIL MOTION HEARD ON 9-17-21 ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66941598 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE MARK H. CONNER ON 9-17-21. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PETITION FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66941705 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 PROPOSED FINAL ORDER ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66937784 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 9/17/2021 - BC REMOVED FROM CALENDAR - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT RE-NOTICED FOR OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 AM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 10/1/2021 - BC REMOVED FROM CALENDAR - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT RE-NOTICED BACK TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 11:00 AM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2021 RE-NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 10 DEL. C. 6601, ET SEQ. TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66932784 RE-NOTICE |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2021 RE-NOTICE OF PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 10 DEL. C. 6601, ET. SEQ. TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMT TRANSACTION ID: 66930468 RE-NOTICE |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT (PHILIP T. EDWARDS) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2021 PETITION FOR PARTIAL TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO THE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENTS ACT, 10 DEL C. 6601, ET SEQ. NOTICE OF PETITION SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. EXHIBIT 1 - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT EXHIBIT 2 - STATEMENT OF INDEPENDENT PROFESSIONAL ADVICE "IPA" EXHIBIT 3 - PURCHASE AGREEMENT AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT EXHIBIT 4 - WRITTEN NOTICE OF TRANSFEREE'S NAMES, ADDRESS AND TAXPAYER IDENTIFICATION NUMBER EXHIBIT 5 - NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTIES EXHIBIT 6 - AFFIDAVIT OF PAYEE MAX MARTINELLI CERTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY FOR TRANSFEREE VERIFICATION BY VICE-PRESIDENT OF PETITIONER PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MS TRANSACTION ID: 66855031 MISC-STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.