Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Oakes, Nancy M, filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryExcess Sheriff Proceeds |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2023 REVISED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 70453106 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
July 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2023 LETTER TO COUNSEL ON JULY 1, 2023 ADVISING THAT THE HEARING IN THIS MATTER IS SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2023 AT 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 70298955 NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - EXCESS SHERIFF PROCEEDS DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2023 PETITION FOR RELEASE OF UNCLAIMED PROCEEDS NOTICE OF MOTION. ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B EXHIBIT C EXHIBIT D EXHIBIT E EXHIBIT F EXHIBIT G EXHIBIT H EXHIBIT I ACCEPTED BY: JCM TRANSACTION ID: 70148733 MISC-EXCESS SHERIFF PROCEEDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.