Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sanchez-Mota, Lorena, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryAppointment Of Guardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2023 IT IS SO ORDERED BY COMM. PARKER ON 8-3-23, TO GRANT THE EXTENSION REQUESTED BY COUNSEL. PROOF OF COMPLIANCE IS DUE BY 9-29-23. ACCEPTED BY: MW TRANSACTION ID: 70575807 ORDER |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2023 LETTER TO THE COURT REQUESTING AN EXTENSION TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT ORDER DATED JUNE 14, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: MW TRANSACTION ID: 70532908 LETTER |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2023 ORDER APPROVING TORT SETTLEMENT OF MINOR SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER PARKER ON JUNE 14, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: MW TRANSACTION ID: 70198500 ORDER |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2023 ORDER ALLOWING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER PARKER ON JUNE 14, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: MW TRANSACTION ID: 70198500 ORDER |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANSHIP DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 10, 2023 PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A GUARDIAN FOR THE PROPERTY OF A MINOR, WITH APPROVAL OF TORT SETTLEMENT OF THE MINOR. EXHIBIT A TO PETITION: BIRTH CERTIFICATE OF THE MINOR (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT B TO PETITION: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSENT OF NON-PETITIONING PARENT (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT C TO PETITION: POLICE REPORT (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT D TO PETITION: MEDICAL RECORDS OF THE MINOR (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT E TO PETITION: PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT F TO PETITION: AFFIDAVIT OF PETITIONER (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT G TO PETITION: PROPOSED DISBURSEMENT (UNDER SEAL) PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER (UNDER SEAL) NOTICE OF MINOR PETITION MOTION OF PETITIONER TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL NOTICE OF MOTION OF PETITIONER TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER - ALLOWING PETITIONER TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL ACCEPTED BY: JCM TRANSACTION ID: 70144216 MISC-APPT OF GUARDIANSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.