Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Flooring Solutions, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Abbott, Richard L, Hindley, Matthew R, Sunshine, Paul D, against Columbia Wegman Newark, Llc, Kbe Building Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JONES JR, FRANCIS J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJONES JR, FRANCIS J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2023 |
CategoryMechanics Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 21, 2023 AFFIDAVIT OF RON RINALDI ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71440541 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2023 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2023 DEFENDANTS COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC AND KBE BUILDING CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC AND KBE BUILDING CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC AND KBE BUILDING CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71422245 ANSWER |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF PAUL D. SUNSHINE, ESQUIRE AND MATTHEW R. HINDLEY, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71421452 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 14, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF PAUL D. SUNSHINE, ESQUIRE AND MATTHEW R. HINDLEY, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT KBE BUILDING CORPORATION WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71383637 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2023 ALIAS SUMMONS TO PLAINTIFF'S ALIAS PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE ON DEFENDANT COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71364972 ALIAS SUMMONS |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S ALIAS PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE ON DEFENDANT COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71360187 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE FOR ISSUANCE OF ALIAS WRIT OF SCIRE FACIAS SUR MECHANICS LIEN TO DEFENDANT COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71360187 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 28, 2023 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(4) EXHIBITS A THROUGH C TO AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(4) ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71211105 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 27, 2023 WRIT RETURNED ON 10/25/23 - NON-EST AS TO COLUMBIA WEGMAN NEWARK, LLC (AT ADDRESS 924 BARKSDALE ROAD, NEWARK, DE 19711 ON 10/24/23. ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 71194795 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.