Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S. Bank N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Foley, Coraann M, Fornias Iii, Edward J, Thompson, Melanie J, against Key, Winchester, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2023 WRIT RETURNED ON 8-25-23. NON-EST AS TO WINCHESTER KEY ON 8-24-23. ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 70716461 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2023 LETTER TO THE JUDICIAL CASE MANAGER PROVIDING A STATUS UPDATE. ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70692404 LETTER |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2023 WRIT RETURNED ON 8-15-23. NON-EST AS TO WINCHESTER KEY ON 8-14-23. ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 70634494 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 5, 2023 (1) WRITS ISSUED TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON AUGUST 3, 2023 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70565149 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 25, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70462843 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF EDWARD J. FORNIAS, III, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF BEAR CROSSING MAINTENANCE CORPORATION, AN INTERESTED PARTY NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70274853 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2023 NON EST INVENTUS NON EST INVENTUS 06-15-2023 12:32 WINCHESTER KEY ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70231502 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2023 (1) WRIT ISSUED TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON JUNE 13, 2023 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70199549 WRIT ISSUED |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2023 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2023 COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT AND SCRA SEARCHES AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS OF DEFENDANTS CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1 EXHIBIT A - MORTGAGE, NOTE, RECORDED ASSIGNMENTS EXHIBIT B - FDCPA LETTER EXHIBIT C - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AMOUNTS DUE EXHIBIT D NOTICE OF INTENT AFFIDAVIT MMED EXHIBIT A NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION MMED EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION PARTICIPATION MMED EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM MMED EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70144969 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.