Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dependable Construction Of De, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Bordley, Dorronda R, Costello, Patrick A, Gouge Jr, Donald L, Havis, Robert P, Mowery, Katharine L, (total of 5) See All against Arline Construction, Ministry Of Caring, Inc., in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryMechanics Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
REMOVED: CASE CONSOLIDATED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 5, 2023 REMOVED: CASE CONSOLIDATED |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M GRANTED WITH AMENDMENTS (STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES, CONSOLIDATING C.A. NO. N23L-01-024 AML WITH C.A. NO. N23L-01-040 AML) THE ACTIONS WILL BE CONSOLIDATED UNDER N23L-01-024 AML. ALL FILINGS SHALL BE IN THAT CASE GOING FORWARD. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69733770 ORDER |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 5, 2023 STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES, CONSOLIDATING C.A. NO. N23L-01-024 AML WITH C.A. NO. N23L-01-040 AML ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69730098 STIPULATION |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 4, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M GRANTED UPON NOTIFICATION OF NO OPPOSITION (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR DOMUS, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE) ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69715387 ORDER |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 4, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO NOTED (LETTER TO THE HONORABLE ABIGAIL M. LEGROW FROM PATRICK A. COSTELLO, ESQ. ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF DOMUS, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND CONFIRMING MOTION TO INTERVENE IS UNOPPOSED SUCH THAT MOTION ARGUMENT SET FOR 4-6-2023 MAY BE CANCELLED) THANK YOU FOR THE DETAILED UPDATE REGARDING THESE MATTERS. THE PENDING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE WILL BE ENTERED, AND COUNSEL NEED NOT APPEAR FOR THE HEARING ON APRIL 6, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69715360 SO NOTED |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 4, 2023 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE ABIGAIL M. LEGROW FROM PATRICK A. COSTELLO, ESQ. ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF DOMUS, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND CONFIRMING MOTION TO INTERVENE IS UNOPPOSED SUCH THAT MOTION ARGUMENT SET FOR 4-6-2023 MAY BE CANCELLED ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69709926 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT 55(b)(1) - PARTIAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2023 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCT_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ARLINE CONSTRUCTION, LLC DEFAULT AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM HOLLEY FOR DEPENDABLE CONSTRUCTION OF DELAWARE, INC. STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE PROTHONOTARY PURSUANT TO RULE 55(B)(1) AGAINST DEFENDANT ARLINE CONSTRUCTION, INC. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ARLINE CONSTRUCTION, LLC WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69634266 PARTIAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED AND ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: REPLY BRIEF DUE: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 15, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF TWO MOTIONS: (1) DEFENDANT MINISTRY OF CARING, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND (2) INTERVENOR DOMUS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS. ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS IS SCHEDULED MAY 30, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. BY COURTSCRIBES. A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS ARE DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2023. IF NO RESPONSE IS RECEIVED, THE RESPECTIVE MOTION WILL BE DEEMED UNOPPOSED. A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION IS DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 24, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. LEGROW, J. ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69337185 BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2023 INTERVENOR DOMUS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF DEPENDABLE CONSTRUCTION'S MECHANICS' LIEN AND OTHER CLAIMS AGAINST THE OWNER, DEFENDANT THEMINISTRY OF CARING, INC. (WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS BY DOMUS, INC. SET FOR MAY 30, 2023 (WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DOMUS' MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENOR DOMUS, INC.'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS (WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) EXH. 1 - AFFIDAVIT OF BRIAN FECONDO IN SUPPORT OF DOMUS' MOTION TO DISMISS (CASE 040 -- 704 N. WEST ST.) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE TYPEFACE REQUIREMENT AND TYPE-VOLUME LIMITATION CONCERNING DOMUS, INC.'S OPENING BRIEF ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69322427 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2023 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY DOMUS, INC. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR DOMUS, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE NOTICE OF MOTION TO INTERVENE BY DOMUS, INC. (SET FOR 4-6-2023) WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EXH. A - MINISTRY-DOMUS LETTER AGREEMENT 2-8-2023 EXH. B - POTENTIAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DOMUS' MOTION TO DISMISS ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69312646 MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.