Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S. Bank N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lawson, Kimberly E, against Tarburton, Kyle S, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: JULY 12, 2023 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD. AN ADDITIONAL VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 20, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 70357905 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 6, 2023 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 70305260 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION (NO FEE) DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 27, 2023 CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION. DEFENDANT ELECTS TO PARTICIPATE. LYNN WILEY, HOUSING COUNSELOR. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70259422 CERTIFICATE PARTICIPATION PA |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MAY 24, 2023 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD. AN ADDITIONAL VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR JULY 5, 2023 AT 11:00 A.M. MEDIATION FEE: NOT REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70066432 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2023 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. A VIRTUAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 17, 2023 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 69843721 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2023 WRIT RETURNED SERVED KYLE S TARBURTON BY LEAVING WITH BETH TARBURTON, MOTHER, ON 3/6/2023 AT 9:45 AM A COPY OF THE WITHIN WRIT TOGETHER WITH A COPY OF THE ALIAS SCIRE FACIAS SUR MORTGAGE AT THE DEFENDANTS USUAL PLACE OF ABODE, 2722 DUNCAN ROAD WILMINGTON, DE 19808 . ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69283132 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2023 1 ALIAS WRIT ISSUED ON 2-23-23 ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 69228011 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69123501 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2023 WRIT RETURNED NON EST INVENTUS BY VIRTUE OF THIS WRIT I HAVE MADE DILIGENT SEARCH FOR THE WITHIN-NAMED KYLE S TARBURTON AND FOR HIS/HER/ITS LAST AND USUAL PLACE OF ABODE/LOCATION, 26 HONEYSUCKLE LANE WILMINGTON, DE 19804 WITH AND FOR HIS TENANT, AGENT, OR ATTORNEY, BUT COULD NOT FIND HIM/HER/IT WITHIN THIS COUNTY; I THEREFORE RETURN THIS WRIT WITHOUT SERVICE. ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 69023410 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2023 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.