Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JURDEN, JAN R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2023 ONE LONG ARM WRIT ISSUED ON 8-22-23. ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70689453 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLURIES PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2023 FIRST PLURIES PRAECIPE FOR DEF. SAMUEL KEODOUANGSY FIRST PLURIES SUMMONS FOR DEF. SAMUEL KEODOUANGSY ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70690351 PLURIES PRAECIPE |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2023 PROOF OF NON-RECEIPT FOR DEF. SAMUEL KEODOUANGSY AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL EX. A - JUNE 27, 2023 LONG ARM LETTER TO DEF. SAMUEL KEODOUANGSY ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70690277 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2023 PROOF OF NON-RECEIPT OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL EX. A - JUNE 27, 2023 LONG ARM LETTER TO DEF. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70639216 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE FOR DEF. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. ALIAS SUMMONS FOR DEF. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT INC. ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70639379 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 11, 2023 DEFENDANT J. B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT J. B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.'S ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70342536 ANSWER |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 7, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF WILLIAM A. CRAWFORD, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT J. B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70315067 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 2, 2023 NOTICE OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT SERVICES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: EP TRANSACTION ID: 70290711 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2023 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS TO SHERIFF OF NEW CASTLE COUNTY SUMMONS TO LAW OFFICES OF DOROSHOW, PASQUALE, KRAWITZ & BHAYA 1 SUMMONS TO LAW OFFICES OF DOROSHOW, PASQUALE, KRAWITZ & BHAYA 2 SUMMONS TO LAW OFFICES OF DOROSHOW, PASQUALE, KRAWITZ & BHAYA 3 ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF RULE 3H STATEMENT EXHIBIT A - POLICE REPORT EXHIBIT B - PHOTOS OF PLAINTIFF'S INJURIES ACCEPTED BY: JDB TRANSACTION ID: 70144594 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2023 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.