Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 28, 2023 NULLA BONA NULLA BONA 10-26-2023 07:24 CALVIN T ANDERSON ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 71209726 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 27, 2023 WRITS ISSUED FOR REPLEVIN FOR SERVICE BY THE NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON OCTOBER 20, 2023. CHECK NUMBER 30802 FOR $75.00 ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 71206297 WRIT ISSUED |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 71048139 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON JANET Z CHARLTON DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2023 ALIAS WRIT OF PROSSESSION ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 71048139 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 30, 2023 NON EST INVENTUS NON EST INVENTUS 09-28-2023 19:45 CALVIN T ANDERSON ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 70987706 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 29, 2023 1 WRIT ISSUED FOR NCC ON AUGUST 28, 2023, CHECK #30696 - $75.00. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70729266 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON JANET Z CHARLTON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 19, 2023 WRIT OF REPLEVIN PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70660826 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN GRANTED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2023 MOTION GRANTED |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2023 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM - MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN HEARING HELD ON AUGUST 9, 2023 BEFORE BUTLER J. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70594177 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2023 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN SIGNED ON AUGUST 9, 2023 BY BUTLER J. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70594217 JUDGMENT BY ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.