Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Palmer, Mary, Williams, Vontiva P., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Long, Heather A, against Bedminster, Anthea, Bedminster, Laurel, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCOTT JR, CALVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 12, 2023 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: VP TRANSACTION ID: 71056972 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
STATUS REPORT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 7, 2023 PLAINTIFFS' LETTER TO THE COURT REGARDING CASE STATUS ACCEPTED BY: VP TRANSACTION ID: 71033236 STATUS REPORT |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
STALL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL REQUESTING RESPONSE BY OCTOBER 17, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: VP TRANSACTION ID: 70997074 STATUS CASE LETTER |
|
June 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2023 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
|
June 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2023 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT RULE 3H STATEMENT FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES SUMMONS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: JDB TRANSACTION ID: 70134908 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.