Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with RENNIE, SHELDON K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: RENNIE, SHELDON SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 71405269 ORDER |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2023 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 71393922 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 19, 2023 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 70633452 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 14, 2023 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 15, 2023 ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS' CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES EXHIBIT TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 70577886 ANSWER |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 7, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF ROBERT D. CECIL, JR., ESQUIRE AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS, GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. AND CHRISTIANA MALL, LLC. ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 70312824 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2023 TWO WRITS ISSUED TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON 6-7-23. CHECK NUMBER 234541- $35.00. ACCEPTED BY: BH TRANSACTION ID: 70197167 WRIT ISSUED |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2023 WRIT RETURNED SERVED, REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 06-09-2023 09:05 CHRISTIANA MALL LLC ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 70189507 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2023 WRIT RETURNED SERVED, REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 06-09-2023 09:05 GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. ACCEPTED BY: ERM TRANSACTION ID: 70189508 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2023 INIT FILING PERSONAL INJURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.