Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Frank Jr., Joseph, Frank, Traci, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wasserman, Adam F, against Tucker, Madonna, Younger, Anthony, Younger, Harriett, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with DAVIS, ERIC M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED FOR: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2023 MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS ANTHONY YOUNGER, HARRIETT YOUNGER, AND DIANNE HAYES TO RESPOND TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES EXHIBIT 1 TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 71307552 MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2023 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, TO BE PRESENTED ON NOVEMBER 20 AT 9:00AM ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 71320581 NOTICE |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2023 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR SERVICE AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME EXHIBITS A-B, MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 71307593 MOTION |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2023 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 71320581 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2023 NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL, TO BE PRESENTED ON MONDAY, NOVEMBER 20 AT 9:00 AM ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 71318989 NOTICE |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 11, 2023 DEFENDANTS' ANTHONY YOUNGER, HARRIETT YOUNGER AND DIANNE HAYES ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 70338107 ANSWER |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 6, 2023 (1) WRIT ISSUED FOR 3104 ON 7-5-23 ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 70309786 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 6, 2023 ALIAS PRAECIPE- MADONNA TUCKER ALIAS SUMMONS-MADONNA TUCKER ACCEPTED BY: BB TRANSACTION ID: 70303927 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2023 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 06-21-2023 11:26 DIANNE HAYES ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70238997 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2023 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 06-21-2023 11:26 HARRIETT YOUNGER ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 70238996 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.