Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2023 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 18, 2023 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: WASTE MANAGEMENT OF FAIRLESS DELAWARE RECYCLABLE PRODUCTS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: Count 1 Plus Pre-Judgment Interest in the amount of $6,893.32. Calculated at the legal rate of 5.25% from June 9, 2021 - April 10. 2023. Plus Post Judgment Interest at the legal rate of 10%. Plus Court Cost. Count 2 Principal 7, 032.15. Plus pre Judgment Interest in the amount of $770.74. Calculated at the legal rate of 5.25% from March 9, 2021 - April 10, 2023. Plus Post Judgment Interest at the legal rate of 10%. Plus Court costs. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $71529.86 ENTRY OF DEFAULT ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69795961 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 18, 2023 AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 69795961 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2023 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 2-23-23, CHECK #69747 $30.00, TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 69266411 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 10, 2023 CORPORATION BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 02-28-2023 13:24 SERVICE TRANSPORT GROUP INC ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 69248317 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2023 COMPLAINT EXHIBITS A EXHIBITS B PRAECIPE SUMMONS CIS ACCEPTED BY: JDB TRANSACTION ID: 69145710 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2023 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.