Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Blythe, Darlene W, Di Lorenzo, Catherine M, against Layaou Jr, Fred P, Layaou, Judy P, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 27, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASEWITHOUT PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70947974 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 27, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASEWITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70929721 NOTICE |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2023 SHERIFF SALE SCHEDULED FOR 9/12/23 STAYED BY ATTORNEY ON SEPTEMBER 1, 2023. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 70770630 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 26, 2023 WRIT OF LAVARI FACIAS ISSUED WITH CHECK SENT TO THE SHERIFF OF NEW CASTLE COUNTY ON JULY 26, 2023 ACCEPTED BY: KC TRANSACTION ID: 70479706 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: JULY 15, 2023 LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MLM TRANSACTION ID: 70388951 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 15, 2023 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: MLM TRANSACTION ID: 70388951 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2023 AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE DI LORENZO ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70199964 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2023 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: FRED P LAYAOU JUDY P LAYAOU JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: YOU ARE ALSO DIRECTED TO $508420.04 INCLUDE JUDGMENT INTEREST TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION,LATE CHARGES TO THE DATE OF CONFIRMATION ,ESCROW ADVANCES TO THE DATE OF CONFIRMATION ,REASONABLE COUNSEL FEES AS PROVIDED IN THE MORTGAGE ,COSTS AND ALL OTHER SUMS NOW DUE OR MAY BECOME DUE UNDER THE MORTGAGE.ANNEXED HERETO IS THE AFFIDAVIT REQUIRED BY SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RUL55 (B)(1) TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $508420.04 DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: ST TRANSACTION ID: 70199964 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2023 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 01-11-2023 11:12 JUDY P LAYAOU ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 68869301 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2023 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 01-11-2023 11:11 FRED P LAYAOU JR ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 68869299 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.