Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2023 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO ORDERED (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, JUDGES SIGNATURE REQUIRED.) ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 69041531 ORDER |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2023 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, JUDGES SIGNATURE REQUIRED. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68997130 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2023 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 1-4-23, CHECK #29896 $30.00, TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68863974 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 23, 2023 JOSEPH MERIGGI, BEING DULY SWORN, DEPOSES THAT HE/SHE IS A DEPUTY SHERIFF AND AVERS THAT HE/SHE SERVED UPON AND LEFT PERSONALLY UPON ANDRE JOHNSON AT 127 STERLING AVENUE CLAYMONT, DE 19703 , ON 1/6/2023 AT 11:01 AM A COPY OF SCIRE FACIAS SUR MORTGAGE. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68832598 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 28, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-1. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68732124 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 22, 2022 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 22, 2022 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS - SHERIFF OF NEW CASTLE COUNTY EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST EXHIBIT E - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT G - FAIR DEBT EXHIBIT H - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE AND STATEMENT OF AMOUNTS DUE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 68691755 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.