Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Director, Delaware Dor, against Marshall, James T, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2022 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2022 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67940259 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2022 GARNISHMENT-JAMES T MARSHALL ACCEPTED BY: ND TRANSACTION ID: 67728817 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2022 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JAMES T MARSHALL JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $278.34 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2022 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 67433623 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.