Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ortiz-Mercado, Ana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by De Cos, Andres G, White, Marissa D, against Wijkowski, Kelsey Lynn, Wijkowski, Robert E., in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68386199 ORDER |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 11, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68371611 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ARBITRATION ORDER PLAINTIFF - DAMAGES AWARDED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2022 ARBITRATOR'S ORDER ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 68222277 ARB ORDER PLTF - DAMAGES |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 24, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. THREE DAY JURY TRIAL: JUNE 3, 2024 AT 9:00 A.M. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: MAY 3, 2024 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67954637 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2022 ARBITRATOR'S LETTER SCHEDULING RULE 16 ARBITRATION FOR OCTOBER 5, 2022 @ 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67842498 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2022 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO SUPERIOR COURT FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67756335 ANSWER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67756335 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2022 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS KELSEY LYNN WIJKOWSKI AND ROBERT E. WIJKOWSKI WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS KELSEY LYNN WIJKOWSKI AND ROBERT E. WIJKOWSKI ACCEPTED BY: RH TRANSACTION ID: 67756335 ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.