Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Sipe Esq, Christopher J, against Fletcher, Charles Edwin-Lee, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CALLED AND LEFT MESSAGE WITH MR. SIPE'S, ESQ. OFFICE ON 11-1-2021 ADVISING THAT HIS EXEMPLIFIED COPY IS READY FOR PICKUP DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 1, 2021 NOTICE |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR COPY OF EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 30, 2021 CORRESPONDENCE SENT BY CHRISTOPHER J. SIPE, ESQ., REQUESTING PREPARATION OF "EXEMPLIFIED" COPY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JUDGMENT DEBTOR CHARLES EDWIN-LEE FLETCHER ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67055435 MISC-EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 "CERTIFIED" COPY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JUDGMENT DEBTOR CHARLES EDWIN-LEE FLETCHER BY THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF THE STATE OF DELAWARE IN AND FOR NEW CASTLE COUNTY ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 67052766 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING COURT OF COMMON PLEAS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: CHARLES EDWIN-LEE FLETCHER JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $11096.80 INIT FILING COURT COMMON PLEAS |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING COURT OF COMMON PLEAS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 29, 2021 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCT_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS INIT FILING COURT COMMON PLEAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.