Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Woodmill Office Condominium Association, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Valihura Jr., Robert J, against Jurewicz, John, Quan, Hai Feng, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2022 SHERIFF SALE STAYED 02-04-2022 03:00 HAI FENG QUAN AND JOHN JUREWICZ ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67323285 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED BY POA FEBRUARY 9TH 2022 DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2022 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2022 JUDGMENT SATISFIED BY POA ON FEBRUARY 9TH 2022 ACCEPTED BY: AB TRANSACTION ID: 67302665 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2022 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (POA) ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 67302306 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2022 AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT J. VALIHURA, JR., ESQUIRE, RE SERVICE OF NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS A-B AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67236677 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX ISSUED WITH CHECK SENT TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON DECEMBER 9TH 2021 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67152568 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2021 WRIT OF VEND EX - LANDS AND TENEMENTS PRAECIPE SHERIFF'S INVENTORY - LANDS AND TENEMENTS ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 67147452 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 4, 2021 LEVY SERVED 11-29-2021 11:10 HAI FENG QUAN AND JOHN JUREWICZ ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 67140484 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 WRIT OF FIFA ATTACHMENT ISSUED ON 9-10-2010, CHECK SENT TO NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF ON 9-10-2021. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66917836 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: FIFA ATTACHMENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 WRIT OF FIERI FACIAS PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66896127 FIFA ATTACHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.