Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Granger, Et Al., Melanie, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against Ace Hardware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2018 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 24, 2019 SUBPOENA SERVED ON NOVEMBER 20, 2018 AT 9:40 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62890662 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2018 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO C OF R FOR WRG, WILMINGTON, DE ON NOVEMBER 12, 2018. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 62668709 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2018 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON NOVEMBER 09, 2018. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 62668709 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.