Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The City Of Wilmington, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Wilcox, Scott G, against Tax Parcel No. 26-022.20-116, Wing, Christine, Wing, Damian, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 14, 2018 JUDGMENT SATISFIED BY SUSAN A HEARN, PROTHONOTARY (POA) ON 11-9-2018 ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 62662228 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 6, 2018 NOTICE OF SATISFACTION - WING ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 62629692 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 21, 2018 SHERIFF SALE STAYED 09-19-2018 11:02 DAMIAN WING TAX PARCEL NO 26-022.20-116 ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 62472561 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 30, 2018 WRIT OF VENDITIONI EXPONAS ISSUED AND CHECK SENT TO SHERIFF ON 08-31-2018 ACCEPTED BY: A TRANSACTION ID: 62392598 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 29, 2018 WRIT OF VEND EXP PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 62390391 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2018 POSTED SERVED 08-07-2018 17:12 DAMIAN WING TAX PARCEL NO 26-022.20-116 ACCEPTED BY: A TRANSACTION ID: 62324260 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2018 WRIT ISSUED FOR WRIT OF MONITION AND CHECK SENT TO SHERIFF ON 08-03-2018 ACCEPTED BY: A TRANSACTION ID: 62294994 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 1, 2018 WRIT OF MONITION EXHIBIT A TO WRIT OF MONITION PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF MONITION ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 62288369 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 1, 2018 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY AGAINST: DAMIAN WING CHRISTINE WING TAX PARCEL NO. 26-022.20-116 JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $5566.07 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.