Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vonruden, Karen, Vonruden, Stephen, filed a(n) Xarelto case represented by Brown, Daniel J, Hrubiec, R. Joseph, Kelly, Michael P, Heisman, James D, against Bayer Bv, Bayer Healthcare Ag, Bayer Pharma Ag, Bayer Corporation, Johnson & Johnson;, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, XARELTO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, XARELTO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2017 |
CategoryXarelto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 27, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62791126 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2017 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES D. HEISMAN OF NAPOLI SHKOLNIK, LLC HEREBY AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IN THESE ACTIONS AND OFFERS A SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL TO R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 61463761 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61057911 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61057816 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61057881 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 25, 2017 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 61020152 ANSWER |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED - 08-11-2017 - BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60986410 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED - 08-11-2017 - JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60986411 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED - 08-11-2017 - BAYER CORPORATION ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60986408 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED - 08-11-2017 - BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60986406 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.