Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morris, Ronnie, Morris, Ruth, filed a(n) Xarelto case represented by Brown, Daniel J, Hrubiec, R. Joseph, Kelly, Michael P, Heisman, James D, against Bayer Bv, Bayer Healthcare Ag, Bayer Pharma Ag, Bayer Corporation, Johnson & Johnson;, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, XARELTO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, XARELTO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2017 |
CategoryXarelto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 27, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62790935 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 14, 2017 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES D. HEISMAN OF NAPOLI SHKOLNIK, LLC HEREBY AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IN THESE ACTIONS AND OFFERS A SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL TO R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61460593 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61223651 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61223686 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2017 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ON AUGUST 1, 2017. THE RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED ON AUGUST 10, 2017 WAS SIGNED FOR AND RECEIVED ON AUGUST 7, 2017 EXHIBIT A - GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILINGS EXHIBIT B - AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61223305 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 25, 2017 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 61020060 ANSWER |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-01-2017 16:25 BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 60964509 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2017 WRIT RETURNED - REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-01-2017 16:25 BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 60964512 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2017 WRIT RETURNED - REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-01-2017 16:25 BAYER CORPORATION ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 60964510 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2017 WRIT RETURNED - REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-02-2017 16:00 JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 60964513 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.