Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hands, Frank Ed, White, Dianna L, Dabah, Adrienne, Paulsen, Nicole, Tuohy, James, (total of 101) See All filed a(n) Xarelto case represented by Bowers Ii, Allen D, Brown, Daniel J, Reardon, Mark L, Galbraith, Michael B, Mcgivney Esq, Eileen M, (total of 7) See All against Bayer Healthcare Ag, Bayer Pharma Ag, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company, Janssen Ortho Llc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, XARELTO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, XARELTO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2017 |
CategoryXarelto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 19, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, XARELTO SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS) ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 62251457 ORDER |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 19, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 62239741 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2017 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHDRAWING THE APPEARANCE OF EILEEN M. MCGIVNEY, ESQ., OF MARC J. BERN & PARTNERS LLP, AND ENTERING THE APPEARANCES OF A. DALE BOWERS, ESQ., AND MICHAEL B. GALBRAITH, ESQ., OF THE LAW OFFICE OF A. DALE BOWERS, P.A., AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61421521 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 20, 2017 PLEASE WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCES OF DIANE M. COFFEY, ESQ. AND KENNETH L. WAN, ESQ., AND ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF EILEEN M. MCGIVNEY, ESQ., OF MARC J. BERN & PARTNERS LLP, AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61261926 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60526571 ANSWER |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT - BAYER CORPORATION CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60526026 ANSWER |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT - BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60526076 ANSWER |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT - BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60526055 ANSWER |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2017 (7) WRITS ISSUED ON 4-5-2017 ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60456994 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 11, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 04-07-2017 14:00 JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 60449655 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.