Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Edelblut, George, Edelblut, Remonia, filed a(n) Xarelto case represented by Brown, Daniel J, Hrubiec, R. Joseph, Kelly, Michael P, Heisman, James D, against Bayer Bv, Does Inc, Bayer Healthcare Ag, Janssen Ortho Llc, Janssen Research & Development Llc Fka Johnson & Johnson Pha, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, XARELTO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, XARELTO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2017 |
CategoryXarelto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 27, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62790747 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60539063 ANSWER |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 22, 2017 ENTITY: JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC. SERVED UPON AMY MCLAREN, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION TRUST COMPANY, ON 4/19/2017 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60499973 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2017 ENTITY: BAYER CORPORATION. SERVED LYNANNE GARES, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, ON 4/13/2017 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60491756 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2017 ENTITY: BAYER HEALTHCARE, LLC. SERVED LYNANNE GARES, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, ON 4/13/2017 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60491757 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2017 ENTITY: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. SERVED LYNANNE GARES, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, ON 4/13/2017 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60491754 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2017 (15) WRITS ISSUED ON 4-5-2017 ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60457085 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ON JAMES D HEISMAN DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 NCC SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60379343 SUMMONS |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ON JAMES D HEISMAN DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2017 NCC SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60375651 SUMMONS |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ON JAMES D HEISMAN DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2017 CORRECTED 3104 SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60371562 SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.