Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peppers, Edward, Peppers, Martha, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against Georgia Pacific Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 SERVED RECORDS CUSTODIAN, FLEXITALLIC ON 06-01-2016. ACCEPTED BY: AMF TRANSACTION ID: 60012052 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2016 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY WITH NCC PROTHONOTARY ON MAY 26, 2016. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 59074164 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2016 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO RC FOR FLEXITALLIC, CARE OF TN SUBFUND OF FED-MOGUL ASB. PER. INJ. TRUST, CARE OF DELAWARE CLAIMS PROCESSING FACILITY, WILMINGTON, DE ON MAY 27, 2016. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 59074164 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.