Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Townsend Esq, Monica Loftin, Miller, Chase N, Charlton, Janet Z, against Wipf, Robin L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with PARKINS JR., JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2016 SO ORDERED VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ON 10-6-16 BY PARKINS, J. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59667759 ORDER |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 6, 2016 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59649254 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2016 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A TRIAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION, WHICH MUST BE VERIFIED BEFORE ANY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK TO DISMISS THE FORECLOSURE ACTION UPON THE CONVERSION OF THE TRIAL MODIFICATION TO A PERMANENT MODIFICATION BY FILING A NOTICE OR STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR BY MOVING THE COURT FOR DISMISSAL NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SUCH CONVERSION. AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 19, 2016 AT 12:30 PM. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59450649 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2016 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. MEDIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 17, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59302597 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2016 AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON TO THE NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS - PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 4(F)(4) EXHIBIT A TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET A. CHARLTON - NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS AND TENANT OF FORECLOSURE ACTION EXHIBIT B TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET A. CHARLTON - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS EXHIBIT C TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET A. CHARLTON - EXECUTED RETURN MAIL RECEIPTS AND RETURNED ENVELOPES EXHIBIT D TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET A. CHARLTON - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59271184 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2016 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 06-14-2016 07:45 ROBIN L WIPF ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59147598 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 6-10-16. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 59146028 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2016 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SCI. FA. EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATION EXHIBIT B TO THE COMPLAINT - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C TO THE COMPLAINT - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D TO THE COMPLAINT - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST EXHIBIT E TO THE COMPLAINT - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F TO THE COMPLAINT ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT G TO THE COMPLAINT - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT H TO THE COMPLAINT - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT I TO THE COMPLAIINT - FAIR DEBT EXHIBIT J TO THE COMPLAINT - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLAINCE AND STATEMENT OF AMOUNT DUE ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 59072571 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2016 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.