Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Black, Edward K, Kogut, Angeline M, against King, James P, represented by Black, Edward K, Kogut, Angeline M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 2, 2018 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT- JAMES P KING ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 61974207 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 20, 2016 TAX WARRANT- JAMES P KING ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59578723 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2016 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59473256 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JAMES P KING JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $993.63 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.