Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Black, Edward K, against Miller, Tosha, represented by Black, Edward K, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 6, 2018 GARNISHMENT - TOSHA MILLER ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 62726850 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2017 TAX WARRANT - TOSHA MILLER ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 61048306 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2016 TAX WARRANT - TOSHA MILLER ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59196499 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2016 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 59075020 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: TOSHA MILLER JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $2888.21 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.