Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Austin, Doylene, Austin, Herman, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Viceconte, Christopher, Heisman, James D, against Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited, Accord Healthcare Inc, Accord Healthcare Ltd, Aventis Pharma Sa, Sanofi Sa, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, TAXOTERE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryTaxotere |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
REMOVED: DISTRICT COURT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 19, 2016 REMOVED: DISTRICT COURT |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 17, 2016 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE BY DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE BY DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 59957308 NOTICE |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PRODUCTS LIABILITY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2016 INIT FILING PRODUCTS LIABILITY |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2016 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION SHEET FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PRAECIPE- NCC AND 3104 3104 SUMMONS HAGUE PRAECIPE HAGUE SUMMONS ACCORD HEALTHCARE LTD AVENTIS PHARMA SA SUMMONS HAGUE SUMMONS INTAS PHARMA LTD HAGUE SUMMONS SANOFI SA HAGUE SUMMONS SUN PHARMA GLOBAL HAGUE NCCO SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 59951723 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.