Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Klingberg, Eleanor, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Shields, Colleen D, Giusini, Brittany M, Rogin, Alexandra D, Murphy, Peter S, Kelly, Michael P, (total of 11) See All against Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America Llc, Imerys Talc America Inc, Imerys Talc Delaware Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, TALC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryTalc |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 30, 2019 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 62908939 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2018 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF RIO TINTO MINERALS INC. AND RIO TINTO MINERAL SERVICES INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF RIO TINTO MINERALS INC. AND RIO TINTO MINERAL SERVICES INC ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 62668874 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 29, 2017 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF U.S. BORAX, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF U.S. BORAX, INC. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 61506130 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 16, 2017 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES D. HEISMAN OF NAPOLI SHKOLNIK, LLC HEREBY AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IN THESE ACTIONS AND OFFERS A SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL TO R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61471954 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 8, 2017 PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 EXHIBIT A GREEN CARD FOR CERTIFIED MAILING EXHIBIT B AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES D. HEISMAN ACCEPTED BY: AMF TRANSACTION ID: 60443384 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 23, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF KEVIN J. CONNORS, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, U.S. BORAX, INC., RIO TINTO MINERALS INC. AND RIO TINTO MINERAL SERVICES INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: AMF TRANSACTION ID: 60371057 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, And Answer To Cross-Claims Of Defendant Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America, LLC (with Certificate of Service) CIS TID 60306156 DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CIS TID 60303706 DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 ANSWER |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with attached Certificate of Service Notice of Motion to Dismiss Proposed Order Granting Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction TID 60300913 DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Valeant Pharmaceuticals, Inc. TID 60300075 DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.