Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Disabatino, Douglas M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcnelis, Brian T, Lengkeek, Timothy E, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 11, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62742976 ORDER |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2018 COURT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SO ORDERED BY LEGROW, J. ON 12-6-2018. ACCEPTED BY: BSB TRANSACTION ID: 62735136 ORDER |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: BSB TRANSACTION ID: 62729571 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 1, 2018 LETTER TO JUDGE LEGROW RE CASE SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62613811 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 31, 2018 CASE SETTLED |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 1, 2018 LETTER TO THE COURT FROM BRIAN MCNELIS RE CASE HAS SETTLED AND WILL NOT BE PROCEEDING TO TRIAL, NOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 2, 2018. ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62614280 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 1, 2018 CONFIRMATION THAT THIS MATTER HAS SETTLED AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES. IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO CLOSE ITS FILE, A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR STATUS LETTER MUST BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS OR THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62614004 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 25, 2018 PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO THE COURT REGARDING JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62592607 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 25, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SO NOTED (PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO THE COURT REGARDING JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL) THE PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST FOR A CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. PLEASE CONTACT MY CHAMBERS TO OBTAIN A NEW TRIAL DATE. PLEASE SEE COMMENT SECTION FOR AVAILABILITY. ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62592976 SO NOTED |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
TRIAL FEE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 20, 2018 IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 77 (H) AND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, YOUR $150 TRIAL FEE IS DUE ON OR BEFORE THE DATE OF THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. FAILURE TO PAY THE TRIAL FEE IN A TIMELY MANNER WILL RESULT IN THIS CASE BEING REMOVED FROM THE TRIAL CALENDAR. ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 62579287 TRIAL FEE LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.