Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dollard, Jermaine, Dollard, Keisha, filed a(n) Civil Miscellaneous (Other) case represented by Allen, Michele D, Funk, Alexander W, Gallagher, Patrick C, Handlon, Joseph C, Jarosz, Carla A, (total of 8) See All against Bailey, Areatha, Bajwa, Irshad, Brown, Hal G, Callery, Richard T, Carroll, Kristin, (total of 20) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Miscellaneous (Other) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Memorandum Opinion. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - GRANTED IN PART.
Date: April 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 15, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M GRANTED WITH AMENDMENTS - PROPOSED ORDER TO DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SEE ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COMMENTS. J. LEGROW OCTOBER 14, 2019. ACCEPTED BY: JFM TRANSACTION ID: 64312232 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 15, 2019 SUPERIOR COURT PROCEEDING WORKSHEET FROM DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PRESENTED ON OCTOBER 14, 2019 BEFORE JUDGE LEGROW. DECISION MOTION GRANTED, CASE DISMISSED. ACCEPTED BY: JFM TRANSACTION ID: 64312364 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 14, 2019 CASE SETTLED |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 11, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M CHAMBERS MAILED A COPY OF THE COURTS BRIEFING LETTER DATED 7-10-19 TO PLAINTIFF'S JERMAINE DOLLARD AND KEISHA DOLLARD (112 DOMINION COURT, SMYRNA, DE 19977) ON 7-10-19. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 63530930 NOTICE |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED AND ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: REPLY BRIEF DUE: DATE DOCKETED: JULY 11, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY THE DHSS DEFENDANTS. ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION IS SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD MONDAY, OCTOBER 14, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION IS DUE ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 28, 2019. DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION IS DUE ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 18, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. LEGROW, J. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63530887 BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS DATE DOCKETED: JULY 10, 2019 DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE THAT DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WILL BE HEARD AT THE CONVENIENCE OF THE COURT EXHIBITS 1 - 4 TO DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PROPOSED ORDER TO DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO DHSS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS ACCEPTED BY: JFM TRANSACTION ID: 63517062 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M CHAMBERS MAILED COPY OF THE COURTS LETTER DATED 5-29-19 AND SECOND AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S JERMAINE DOLLARD AND KEISHA DOLLARD (112 DOMINION COURT, SMYRNA, DE 19977) ON 5-31-19. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 63310455 NOTICE |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M SECOND AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULIING ORDER. FIVE DAY JURY TRIAL: JUNE 8, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: MAY 14, 2020 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: BSB TRANSACTION ID: 63310419 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 31, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M LETTER FROM LEGROW, J. TO PLAINTIFFS REGARDING THE AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. DEADLINE TO REPORT SCHEDULING CONFLICT IS JUNE 15, 2019. ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 63304967 LETTER |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: BSB TRANSACTION ID: 63303949 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.