Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weichert Financial Services, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Charlton, Janet Z, against Poole, Wilhemenia A, Poole, Wilhelmenia, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2016 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 58684370 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 EXHIBIT B - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57876267 EXHIBITS |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 EXHIBIT C - EXECUTED RETURN RECEIPTS ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57876267 EXHIBITS |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 EXHIBIT D - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57876267 EXHIBITS |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON TO THE NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS - PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 4(F)4 ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57876267 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 EXHIBIT A - NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS AND TENANT OF FORECLOSURE ACTION ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57876267 EXHIBITS |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 29, 2015 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 08-27-2015 09:59 WILHELMENIA POOLE AKA WILHELMENIA A POOLE ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57783564 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2015 1 WRIT ISSUED ON 8-7-15. ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 57673845 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2015 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SCI.FA. EXHIBIT A - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT B - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT C - FAIR DEBT ACCEPTED BY: JDB TRANSACTION ID: 57635359 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2015 INIT FILING MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.