Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
United Electric Supply Co Inc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Tacconelli, Theodore J, against Westco New Castle Iii Llc, Westco New Castle Ii Llc, White & Greenup Construction Co Llc, Electrical Controls & Maintenance Inc, Fedex Ground Package System Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with PARKINS JR., JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryMechanics Lien |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2015 RESCINDED RESCINDED 03-19-2015 13:00 WESTCO NEW CASTLE II LLC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 56948248 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 03-18-2015 12:00 FEDEX GROUND PACKAGING SYSTEMS INC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 56948247 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2015 RESCINDED RESCINDED 03-19-2015 13:00 WESTCO NEW CASTLE III LLC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 56948249 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 20, 2015 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTION TO PROTHONOTARY TO REFLECT DISMISSAL ON THE MECHANIC'S LIEN DOCKET CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTION TO PROTHONOTARY TO REFLECT DISMISSAL ON THE MECHANIC'S LIEN DOCKET ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 56945403 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2015 (10) WRITS ISSUED ON 3-12-15. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 56908931 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MECHANIC LIEN FILED 27-FEB-2015 FOR THE FURNISHING OF MATERIALS AND LABOR ON THE CREDIT OF SAID STRUCTURE. THE STRUCTURE IS LOCATED MORE PARTICULARILY DESCRIBED TO WIT: TAX PARCEL NO: LIEN DATE: DEMAND: $ DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2015 INIT FILING MECHANIC LIEN |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2015 COMPLAINT AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM FOR MECHANIC'S LIEN EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B; BILL OF PARTICULARS EXHIBIT C; AFFIDAVIT OF DEMAND PRAECIPE SUMMONS SCIRE FACIAS SUR MECHANIC'S LIEN SUMMONS SUMMONS LONG ARM SCIRE FACIAS SUR MECHANIC'S LIEN SUMMONS LONG ARM CASE INFORMATION SHEET ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 56838753 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.